NY A00694 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities' official functions.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll records, and commuter railroad and transit records to protect privacy, unless necessary to perform law enforcement functions of certain public officials and bodies or to further another public entities' official functions.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.33 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.473 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06287 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES