NY A00682 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.
Title
Relates to the taxation of property owned by a cooperative corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | print number 682a |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01000 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1000A