NY A00673 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "adversarial medical examination procedure act"; authorizes adversarial medical examinations and limits any physician-patient relationship resulting from such a medical examination; provides that the person subject to the examination shall have the right to representation.
Title
Enacts the "adversarial medical examination procedure act"; authorizes adversarial medical examinations and limits any physician-patient relationship resulting from such a medical examination; provides that the person subject to the examination shall have the right to representation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.191 |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05373 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY