NY A00610 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from charging a fee for records where an electronic copy is already available from a previous request made within the past six months except for the actual cost of a storage device or media if provided to the requester.
Title
Prohibits agencies from charging a fee for records where an electronic copy is already available from a previous request made within the past six months except for the actual cost of a storage device or media if provided to the requester.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.7 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.157 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2220 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.20 |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.20 |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02220 (Same As) 2023-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A610