NY S02220 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from charging a fee for records where an electronic copy is already available from a previous request made within the past six months except for the actual cost of a storage device or media if provided to the requester.
Title
Prohibits agencies from charging a fee for records where an electronic copy is already available from a previous request made within the past six months except for the actual cost of a storage device or media if provided to the requester.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A610 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.157 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00610 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.7