NY A00459 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - signed chap.629
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - signed chap.629
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.
Title
Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Assembly | signed chap.629 |
2021-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.385 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S674 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.35 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00674 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A459