NY A00362 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2884a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2884a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties for code violations; provides penalties for subsequent violations.
Title
Relates to penalties for code violations; provides penalties for subsequent violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s2884a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.406 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 362a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02884 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.32