NY S02884 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to penalties for code violations; provides penalties for subsequent violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to penalties for code violations; provides penalties for subsequent violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.406
2021-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a362a
2021-06-01Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2021-06-01AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenateREPASSED SENATE
2021-05-24SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2884A
2021-05-24SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-20Senatereturned to senate
2021-05-20AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2021-03-09Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2021-03-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.199
2021-01-26SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00362 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2884a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback