NY A00292 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the imposition of penalties and remedies in suits brought for the vindication of civil rights or human rights; reasonable attorney's fee, reasonable expert fees.
Title
Relates to the imposition of penalties and remedies in suits brought for the vindication of civil rights or human rights; reasonable attorney's fee, reasonable expert fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 292b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.12 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.635 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.635 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | print number 292a |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06078 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6078A