NY A00154 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no motor vehicle repair shop shall repair a tire that would not pass New York state inspection.
Title
Provides that no motor vehicle repair shop shall repair a tire that would not pass New York state inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.5 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 154 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 154a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.212 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02961 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION