NY A00123 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4739a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4739a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the administration of certain immunizations; requires immunizing agents be administered to adults by pharmacists; authorizes a licensed pharmacist and certified nurse practitioner to administer certain immunizing agents and meningococcal disease immunizing agents; makes provisions permanent.
Title
Relates to the administration of certain immunizations; requires immunizing agents be administered to adults by pharmacists; authorizes a licensed pharmacist and certified nurse practitioner to administer certain immunizing agents and meningococcal disease immunizing agents; makes provisions permanent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4739a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.512 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.512 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | print number 123b |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 123a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04739 (Same As) 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.46