NY S04739 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the administration of certain immunizations; requires immunizing agents be administered to adults by pharmacists; authorizes a licensed pharmacist and certified nurse practitioner to administer certain immunizing agents and meningococcal disease immunizing agents; makes provisions permanent.
Title
Relates to the administration of certain immunizations; requires immunizing agents be administered to adults by pharmacists; authorizes a licensed pharmacist and certified nurse practitioner to administer certain immunizing agents and meningococcal disease immunizing agents; makes provisions permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.46 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.512 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a123b |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1536 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4739A |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00123 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4739a