NY A00071 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the scope of protections against discrimination on the basis of disability in services provided by public entities including exclusion from participation or denial of benefits, services, programs or activities of a public entity and refusal of a public entity to make reasonable accommodations unless such entity can establish undue hardship; defines terms.
Title
Clarifies the scope of protections against discrimination on the basis of disability in services provided by public entities including exclusion from participation or denial of benefits, services, programs or activities of a public entity and refusal of a public entity to make reasonable accommodations unless such entity can establish undue hardship; defines terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.6 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.141 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02407 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS