NY A00062 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - print number 62a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - print number 62a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax exemption from sales and compensating use taxes on alternative energy systems including alternative energy systems, new Energy Star appliances and tangible personal property used in or on habitable residential and non-residential structure to improve energy efficiency; and defines relevant terms; authorizes municipalities to adopt the exemption.
Title
Provides a tax exemption from sales and compensating use taxes on alternative energy systems including alternative energy systems, new Energy Star appliances and tangible personal property used in or on habitable residential and non-residential structure to improve energy efficiency; and defines relevant terms; authorizes municipalities to adopt the exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Assembly | print number 62a |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02635 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 2635A