NV SCR1 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - File No. 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - File No. 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging employers in this State to provide personal protective equipment to employees to prevent the spread of COVID-19.
Title
Urges employers in this State to provide personal protective equipment to employees to prevent the spread of COVID-19. (BDR R-189)
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Dallas Harris [D] | Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | File No. 14. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Resolution read and adopted. To Senate. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Resolution read. To committee. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |