NV SB94 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to family planning; revising provisions governing the Account for Family Planning; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the Account for Family Planning. (BDR 40-446)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 266.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-23AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-14AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-05-14AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-13SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-10SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-10SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 668.) To printer.
2019-05-09SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-08SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 654.) To printer.
2019-05-07SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-16SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 134.)
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-24SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2019-01-25SenateFrom printer.
2019-01-24SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback