NV SB63 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Judicial Department of State Government; making various changes relating to the policies and procedures of the Judicial Department; authorizing a judge to hold court by means of remote communication in certain circumstances; requiring the Nevada Supreme Court to prescribe certain policies and procedures relating to the Judicial Department by rule; authorizing a judge or justice of the peace to have a partner or associate who practices law in this State under certain circumstances; revising the duties of the Court Administrator; replacing the term regulation with rule for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to the Judicial Department; revising provisions relating to court interpreters; codifying in statute language from the Nevada Constitution relating to the expiration of the term of office for a justice appointed to fill a vacancy on the Nevada Supreme Court; revising provisions concerning the provision of certain resources to the Supreme Court and the district courts; providing that certain orders for protection issued in another state are not subject to certain requirements to be given full faith and credit in this State; repealing obsolete provisions relating to the Judicial Department; repealing various provisions relating to court seals, qualifications of certain employees and reports; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Judicial Department of State Government. (BDR 1-435)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 427. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 632 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 632.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 165.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |