NV SB453 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to financial services; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Institutions, in furtherance of his or her duties or the duties of the Division of Financial Institutions of the Department of Business and Industry with respect to the issuance and renewal of certain licenses and certificates, to participate in the Nationwide Multistate Licensing System and Registry; authorizing the Commissioner to take certain actions relating to participation in the Registry; revising the requirements for applicants for certain licenses or certificates issued by the Commissioner and by the Division; revising provisions relating to the expiration and renewal of certain licenses or certificates issued by the Commissioner and by the Division; requiring the holders of certain licenses or certificates issued by the Commissioner to submit certain reports to the Registry; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain persons licensed or certified by the Division of Financial Institutions of the Department of Business and Industry or the Commissioner of Financial Institutions. (BDR 55-1095)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |