NV SB448 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chapter 552.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to utilities; revising provisions governing partial tax abatements for certain renewable energy facilities; revising provisions governing the use of money in the Renewable Energy Account; repealing provisions governing the Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Demonstration Program; requiring an electric utility to submit a plan to accelerate transportation electrification in this State; requiring an electric utility to file a plan for certain high-voltage transmission infrastructure projects; requiring the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to require a transmission provider to join a regional transmission organization; creating and setting forth the powers, duties and membership of the Regional Transmission Coordination Task Force; providing that there is no presumption that the expenditures of a utility were prudently incurred for certain purposes; revising the definition of public utility; revising provisions governing the disposal of generation assets; revising provisions governing the Economic Development Electric Rate Rider Program; revising requirements for the energy efficiency plan of an electric utility; abolishing the New Energy Industry Task Force; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing public utilities. (BDR 58-46)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Chapter 552. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 831 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 831.) To printer. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 731.) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: May 13, 2021. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |