NV SB428 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxes on retail sales; providing for the submission to the voters of the question whether the Sales and Use Tax Act of 1955 should be amended to provide an exemption from the tax for child and adult diapers; providing for the exemptions from certain analogous taxes if the voters approve this amendment to the Sales and Use Tax Act of 1955; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Proposes to exempt sales of diapers from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes upon approval by the voters. (BDR 32-1033)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |