NV SB419 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; revising provisions governing the assessment and taxation of property which is sold or transferred; enacting provisions to provide property tax assistance to senior citizens and persons with disabilities; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to property taxes. (BDR 32-741)
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 09, 2019. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6778/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB419.pdf |