NV SB416 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 417.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 417.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Department of Corrections; requiring the Director of the Department of Corrections to adopt regulations governing the operation of a commissary in an institution or facility; authorizing the Director to adopt regulations governing the possession of personal property by offenders; revising provisions relating to the deduction of certain costs from the individual account of an offender; revising provisions relating to the deduction of money from the wages earned by an offender; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Department of Corrections. (BDR 16-322)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 417. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 829.) |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |