NV SB363 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 526. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 526. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to affordable housing; authorizing the Housing Division of the Department of Business and Industry to prioritize funding for projects related to affordable housing that give preference to certain persons; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to affordable housing. (BDR 25-1029)
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Richard Daly [D] | Sen. Dallas Harris [D] | Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Julie Pazina [D] | Sen. Melanie Scheible [D] | Rep. Reuben D'Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 526. (Effective October 1, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 629 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 629.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |