NV SB363 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to regional commercial air service in this State. (BDR 18-92)
Title
Makes various changes relating to regional commercial air service in this State. (BDR 18-92)
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] | Sen. Don Gustavson [R] |
Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] | Rep. Al Kramer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=809 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB363.pdf |