NV SB357 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to pharmacists. (BDR 54-869)
Title
Revises provisions relating to pharmacists. (BDR 54-869)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=790 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB357.pdf |