NV SB318 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 420.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 420.
Summary
Revises provisions governing tuition paid by persons in the Armed Forces of the United States and by veterans at campuses of the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-744)
Title
Revises provisions governing tuition paid by persons in the Armed Forces of the United States and by veterans at campuses of the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-744)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 420. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-27 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2009-04-17 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 500.) | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-17 | From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance. | |
2009-03-23 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=884 |