NV SB303 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Department of Education for incentives for teachers who have received a national board certification and are employed to teach at certain Title I schools; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation for incentives for teachers who have received a national board certification and are employed to teach at certain Title I schools. (BDR S-1070)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1118.) |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |