NV SB298 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to plan for and establish programs for the study of energy efficiency and renewable energy resources within the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-1075)
Title
Authorizes the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to plan for and establish programs for the study of energy efficiency and renewable energy resources within the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-1075)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 216.) To printer. | |
2009-04-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=861 |