NV SB297 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to agriculture; revising provisions relating to a plan to inventory vacant and blighted lands in a master plan; requiring the Council on Food Security to research and develop recommendations on community gardens and urban farms; authorizing a board of county commissioners to approve a partial abatement of ad valorem taxes for owners of real property who agree to the use of real property for community gardens or urban farms; revising provisions authorizing the governing body of a county or city to allow the use of vacant county or city owned lands for community gardening; authorizing the Director of the Department of Transportation to lease certain real property for community gardens and urban farms under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to agriculture. (BDR 22-480)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 695.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 381.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |