NV SB293 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; prohibiting an employer or employment agency from seeking or relying on the wage or salary history of an applicant for employment; prohibiting an employer or employment agency from refusing to interview, hire, promote or employ an applicant or from discriminating or retaliating against an applicant if the applicant does not provide wage or salary history; prohibiting the governing body of a county, incorporated city or unincorporated town or an appointing authority from performing such actions; requiring an employer, an employment agency, the governing body of a county, incorporated city or unincorporated town and an appointing authority to provide the wage or salary range or rate for a position, promotion or transfer to a new position if certain conditions are satisfied; providing that an employer, an employment agency, the governing body of a county, incorporated city or unincorporated town or an appointing authority may ask an applicant about his or her wage or salary expectations; providing that a violation of such provisions is an unlawful employment practice; providing that a person may file a complaint for a violation of such provisions; providing that an employer or employment agency that violates such provisions may be subject to certain administrative penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 53-907)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 293.
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-25SenateAssembly Amendment No. 569 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Absent: 1.) To Senate.
2021-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 569.) To printer.
2021-05-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2021-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-16SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 416.) To printer.
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-24SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback