NV SB291 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the determination of damage awards in certain civil actions. (BDR 3-951)
Title
Provides for the determination of damage awards in certain civil actions. (BDR 3-951)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 879.) To printer. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer. |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |