NV SB289 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Assembly Amendment No. 635 concurred in. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Assembly Amendment No. 635 concurred in. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes; expanding the applicability of enhanced penalties for assault or battery against a provider of health care under certain circumstances; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to crimes against providers of health care. (BDR 15-996)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-27 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 635 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 635.) To printer. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 170.) To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |