NV SB274 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child welfare; providing for the licensure of receiving centers for commercially sexually exploited children and the certification of certain other facilities and entities that provide services to such children; imposing certain requirements concerning the operation of a receiving center; revising the actions that an agency which provides child welfare services is required to take in response to a report of the commercial sexual exploitation of a child; delaying the effective date of provisions prohibiting the adjudication of a child as delinquent or the assignment of a child to a detention facility in certain circumstances; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to commercially sexually exploited children. (BDR 38-705)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 571.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 262.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |