NV SB210 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child welfare; requiring the development of a plan for the education of certain children admitted by a court to a psychiatric hospital or facility which provides residential treatment for mental illness; requiring a school district providing services to such a child to submit certain programs and plans to the psychiatric hospital; requiring a school district providing services to a child admitted to a facility which provides residential treatment for mental illness to monitor the progress and participate in transition planning for the child; requiring a school district providing services to a child who is admitted to a facility which provides residential treatment for mental illness to convene certain meetings before the admission of the child to the facility; requiring the Department of Education to adopt regulations relating to the transition from a facility which provides residential treatment for mental illness to a school or other educational setting after discharge; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the education of a child with an emotional disturbance. (BDR 38-561)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 434.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |