NV SB200 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the pilot diversion program for certain probation violators. (BDR S-744)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the pilot diversion program for certain probation violators. (BDR S-744)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |