NV SB178 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to pupil health. (BDR 34-235)
Title
Revises provisions relating to pupil health. (BDR 34-235)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 186.) To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |