NV SB166 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 24.
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 24.
Summary
Designates the official state insect of Nevada. (BDR 19-914)
Title
Designates the official state insect of Nevada. (BDR 19-914)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 24. | |
2009-04-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-27 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-24 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-03-27 | In Assembly. | |
2009-03-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-23 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-19 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-05 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=462 |