NV SB129 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to ethics in government; making various changes relating to the provisions governing ethics in government; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to ethics in government. (BDR 23-191)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 837.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 526.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | From printer. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |