NV ACR7 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - File No. 48.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - File No. 48.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study of issues relating to driving under the influence of marijuana.
Title
Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study of issues relating to driving under the influence of marijuana. (BDR R-758)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Assembly | File No. 48. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Resolution File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Without recommendation. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Resolution read and adopted. To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Placed on Resolution File. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from Resolution File. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |