NV AB9 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to behavioral health; authorizing a regional behavioral health policy board to employ certain staff; requiring the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to provide certain assistance to a regional behavioral health policy board; authorizing a regional behavioral health policy board to engage in certain activities; prescribing certain duties of a regional behavioral health policy board; requiring each mental health consortium to submit a long-term strategic plan to the respective regional behavioral health policy boards; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing regional behavioral health policy boards. (BDR 39-385)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-15 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/9534/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/AB/AB9.pdf |