NV AB8 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; revising certain definitions relating to gaming; requiring additional persons to register with the Nevada Gaming Control Board; revising provisions governing entry fees for contests and tournaments and compensation for online interactive gaming in the calculation of the monthly gaming license fee based on the gross revenue of the license holder; exempting certain officers and employees of the Board from the provisions governing the State Personnel System; authorizing the Nevada Gaming Commission to adopt regulations governing the use of electronic signatures for credit instruments; revising provisions governing certain fees collected upon the conclusion of a gaming operation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to gaming. (BDR 41-278)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 251. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 497 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 497.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 136.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |