NV AB70 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state financial administration; revising provisions governing deposits of public money under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the deposit of child support payments collected by the Division of Welfare and Supportive Services of the Department of Health and Human Services. (BDR 31-299)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Chapter 82. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |