NV AB67 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising provisions relating to the suspension or expulsion of a pupil from a public school, charter school or university school for profoundly gifted pupils in certain circumstances; providing that certain hearings and proceedings relating to suspending or expelling a pupil are not subject to the Open Meeting Law; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-293)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 538 and 768 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 768.) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: May 24, 2021. |
2021-05-22 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 538.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 115.) To printer. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |