NV AB57 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring that pupil growth account for 0 percent of certain teacher and administrator evaluations for the 2021-2022 school year; requiring that pupil growth account for 15 percent of certain teacher and administrator evaluations beginning with the 2022-2023 school year; temporarily suspending the requirement to develop learning goals for pupils to measure pupil growth; clarifying that pupil growth accounts for 0 percent of certain teacher and administrator evaluations for the entirety of the 2020-2021 school year; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Temporarily suspends certain requirements relating to certain teacher and administrator evaluations. (BDR 34-434)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 616 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 616.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 20.) To printer. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |