NV AB509 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Department of Business and Industry for implementation of an electronic management system for public works and prevailing wage surveys in the Office of the Labor Commissioner. (BDR S-1207)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Department of Business and Industry for implementation of an electronic management system for public works and prevailing wage surveys in the Office of the Labor Commissioner. (BDR S-1207)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1013.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |