NV AB498 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Division of Emergency Management of the Department of Public Safety for a joint field office to work with the Federal Emergency Management Agency on certain flood reimbursements. (BDR S-1172)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Division of Emergency Management of the Department of Public Safety for a joint field office to work with the Federal Emergency Management Agency on certain flood reimbursements. (BDR S-1172)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 438. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 1121 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1121.) To printer. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |