NV AB493 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 482.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Chapter 482.
Summary
Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Chapter 482. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) | |
2009-06-01 | Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 2:20 p.m. | |
2009-05-31 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2009-05-30 | Returned to Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-20 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 275.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=952 |