NV AB478 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 189.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 189.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to law enforcement; revising provisions governing the standards for programs of continuing education for peace officers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires annual completion by all peace officers of continuing education in certain subjects. (BDR 23-1002)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Chapter 189. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |