NV AB450 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workforce development; directing the Governor of the State of Nevada to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning opportunities to align workforce training and programs offered by community colleges in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to workforce development. (BDR S-1108)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 503.) To printer. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 9, 2021. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |