NV AB446 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; revising provisions governing the exemption of certain older motor vehicles from emission control compliance; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to motor vehicles. (BDR 43-1092)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-31 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/8118/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB446.pdf |